U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Palmer v. Mississippi Valley Regional Blood Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 10, 2020: [Substitute Party]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 01, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.