U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Lillibridge v. Tejada et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 28, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 27, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 02, 2020: [Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 14, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 14, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.