U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04082
  • Case Name: Doe v. Dordt University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 23, 2023: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • January 23, 2023: [Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 26, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 18, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • March 15, 2021: [Seal Document]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • January 04, 2021: [Seal Document]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Exparte Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.