U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Stewart v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • July 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 21, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2020: [Leave]
  • July 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 29, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.