U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Blackburn v. Dee Zee Manufacturing et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Closing Documents]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Status Report]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 24, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.