U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Miller et al v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.