U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Darling v. Boecker et al - Plt Massingham dismissed at #27
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.