U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Clayton v. Des Moines Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 23, 2020: [Reply]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 19, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 17, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 08, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.