U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Gaines v. Walmart Supercenter #5115
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.