U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Baum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 02, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • September 16, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [New Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 20, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 10, 2021: [New Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 14, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • April 12, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 09, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • April 09, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 09, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 08, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 08, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Statement]
  • April 07, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 06, 2021: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 05, 2021: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 01, 2021: [Trial Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 08, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.