U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Stone v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 11, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 10, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2020: [Order]
  • March 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • March 13, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2020: [Errata]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.