U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Criss v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Affidavit]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 28, 2020: [Order]
  • March 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.