U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Schmit v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.