U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03051
  • Case Name: Regent Insurance Company v. White Transfer and Storage Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 16, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 16, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 05, 2020: [Strike]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.