U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-03068
  • Case Name: Heiden v. Boffeil et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Expenses]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.