U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Htoo v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • March 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.