U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Holloway v. Polk County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.