U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-04022
  • Case Name: Sunrise Farms, Inc. v. Sabre Energy Services, LLC et al- See ORDERS AT #206 and #210 REGARDING TERMINATED PARTIES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.