U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Kauzlarich et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • May 05, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 28, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.