U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00059
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Five Firearms, Assorted Ammunition, and One Bump Stock Seized from 102 East Ringgold Street, Creston, Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Default Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 22, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • February 25, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • February 24, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.