U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Rockwell v. Kelly Gorman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 15, 2020: [Transfer Case]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 26, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.