U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00070
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $14,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately 66 Firearms, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Writ Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Writ Issued]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 27, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.