U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Iowa Steak Company, L.C. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • March 02, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 27, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.