U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Risen Son Christian Village v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 25, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 22, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • March 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.