U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Flanagan et al v. HGT Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Compel]
  • January 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2021: [Compel]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 08, 2020: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • September 22, 2020: [Brief /Other]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.