U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00009
  • Case Name: GLJ, Inc v. United States of America. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 15, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 02, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 01, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Leave]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • March 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.