U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Hale et al v. Davenport Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 04, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.