U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Ocampo v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.