U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Sheets v. Veren et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 19, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 26, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 04, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 05, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 07, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 06, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 01, 2020: [Leave]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.