U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Thomson v. International Paper Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 21, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 31, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 31, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.