U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02063
  • Case Name: Hoffert v. Westendorf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 28, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.