U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Woody et al v. Jasper County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 08, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.