U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Brewbaker v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • August 05, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • July 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • June 19, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • June 19, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2020: [Recusal]
  • June 18, 2020: [Writ]
  • June 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Recusal]
  • April 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 23, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2020: [Writ]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.