U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Chaudoin v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2021: [Remand]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Remand]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Brief /Other]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.