U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Cruz v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 07, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.