U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Gillard et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 26, 2021: [Substitute Party]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 12, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • October 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.