U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Jaye v. Barr et al--PER #3 ORDER PLAINTIFF AUTHORIZED TO EMAIL HER PLEADINGS - PER #25 ORDER - EMAIL AND MAIL ALL DOCKETED FILINGS TO PLT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Joinder]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • September 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2020: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Default Entry]
  • September 21, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 01, 2020: [Substitute Party]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2020: [Strike]
  • June 02, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Default Entry]
  • May 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2020: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • May 06, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.