U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Medeiros v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 20, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 09, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Status Report]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 18, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.