U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00131
  • Case Name: General Motors LLC v. Kraig Ford, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 15, 2020: [Status Report Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 06, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.