U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Hendricks et al v. FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • January 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • July 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 29, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • May 11, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.