U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Clawson v. Weitzall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 12, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • March 10, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 12, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.