U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00042
  • Case Name: McIntyre v. Dakota Minnesota and Eastern Railroad Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • January 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 04, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 03, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • December 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 23, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • December 23, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 27, 2021: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • October 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 19, 2021: [Quash]
  • July 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 24, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 22, 2020: [Statement]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • June 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.