U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Beckett v. Bonifazi et al - See Order #17 dismissing USM, #33 Order dismissing CRPD and Unknown Police Dog
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 08, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • April 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.