U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02029
  • Case Name: Davidson et al v. Floyd County, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.