U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00143
  • Case Name: National Roofing Industry Pension Fund et al v. Wood Roofing Company. Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 18, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.