U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Reed et al v. Ag Manufacturing & Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 04, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 22, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.