U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01005
  • Case Name: Riekens v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
  • January 05, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.