U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Carter v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • March 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • January 12, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • January 10, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Errata]
  • January 07, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 20, 2021: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 11, 2021: [Crossclaim]
  • February 10, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 25, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 11, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 03, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 12, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • October 09, 2020: [Add Party]
  • October 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 23, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.