U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Sattler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Reply]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 05, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 02, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • June 29, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 21, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.