U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.